As on : September 20,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000143438
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | ASHIRWAD CAPITAL LIMITED | L51900MH1985PLC036117 | 28-09-2015 | 05-03-1985 | ₹4,00,00,000 | |
2 | PENGUIN ELECTRONICS PRIVATE LIMITED | U31209MH1983PTC031258 | 01-11-1983 | 11-01-1983 | ₹1,66,66,670 | |
3 | PENGUIN ELECTRONICS PRIVATE LIMITED | U31209MH1983PTC031258 | 01-11-1983 | 01-11-1983 | ₹11,66,66,690 | |
4 | SWASTI VINAYAKA ART AND HERITAGE CORPORATION LIMITED | L51900MH1985PLC036536 | 28-09-2015 | 06-10-1985 | ₹4,00,00,000 | |
5 | SWASTI VINAYAKA SYNTHETICS LIMITED | L99999MH1981PLC024041 | 27-09-2014 | 03-09-1981 | ₹7,00,00,000 | |
6 | TULIP ELECTROAPPLIANCES PRIVATE LIMITED | U29300MH2000PTC125522 | 01-09-2007 | 31-03-2000 | ₹5,00,000 | |
7 | VEKEN DEMI TECHNOLOGY PRIVATE LIMITED | U32302MH2018PTC310359 | 05-06-2018 | 05-06-2018 | ₹1,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00143438 | RAKESH KUMAR GARODIA (7) |
2 | 00164011 | RAJESH RAMPRASAD PODDAR (3) |
3 | 00164141 | SHILPA DINESH PODDAR (3) |
4 | 00164182 | DINESH PODDAR RAMPRASAD (3) |
5 | 00175621 | MADHUSUDAN LOHIA (6) |
6 | 00205957 | ALKA ARUN GARODIA (1) |
7 | 00205971 | KUSUM ASHOK GARODIA (2) |
8 | 00205984 | GAYATRIDEVI NATHMAL GARODIA (2) |
9 | 00206010 | ARUN KUMAR GARODIA (3) |
10 | 00206017 | ASHOKKUMAR NATHMAL GARODIA (1) |
11 | 00381643 | SANJIV VISHWANATH RUNGTA (3) |
12 | 08729717 | RHEA DINESH PODDAR (3) |
13 | 08882779 | ARYAN RAJESH PODDAR (3) |
14 | 09637477 | PRABHAT DINESH PODDAR (3) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.