As on : September 20,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000175621
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | ASHIRWAD CAPITAL LIMITED | L51900MH1985PLC036117 | 28-12-2020 | 05-03-1985 | ₹4,00,00,000 | |
2 | OXEMBERG FASHIONS LIMITED | L17120MH1999PLC032256 | 01-03-2000 | 28-05-1999 | ₹50,00,000 | |
3 | SANCHNA TRADING AND FINANCE LIMITED | L51900MH1985PLC035160 | 03-12-1992 | 24-01-1985 | ₹49,90,000 | |
4 | SEEOM FABRICS LIMITED | U17120MH1994PLC076885 | 20-08-2009 | 03-02-1994 | ₹23,50,000 | |
5 | SWASTI VINAYAKA ART AND HERITAGE CORPORATION LIMITED | L51900MH1985PLC036536 | 28-12-2020 | 06-10-1985 | ₹4,00,00,000 | |
6 | SWASTI VINAYAKA SYNTHETICS LIMITED | L99999MH1981PLC024041 | 28-12-2020 | 03-09-1981 | ₹7,00,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00143438 | RAKESH KUMAR GARODIA (7) |
2 | 00164011 | RAJESH RAMPRASAD PODDAR (3) |
3 | 00164141 | SHILPA DINESH PODDAR (3) |
4 | 00164182 | DINESH PODDAR RAMPRASAD (3) |
5 | 00175621 | MADHUSUDAN LOHIA (6) |
6 | 00187216 | SURESH TODI (1) |
7 | 00214387 | SANDEEP SAJJANKUMAR JHUNJHUNWALLA (3) |
8 | 00381643 | SANJIV VISHWANATH RUNGTA (3) |
9 | 00392398 | RAMNARAYAN BANWARILAL AGARWAL (1) |
10 | 07244048 | TARKESHWAR SINGH (3) |
11 | 07244070 | PRADEEP SUNDERLAL JAIN (4) |
12 | 07537067 | JITENDRA SINGH HADA (2) |
13 | 08360102 | AMIT JAISANSARIA (1) |
14 | 08360160 | PARTH SARAOGI ARJUN (1) |
15 | 08360183 | SAKSHI RAMESH DHANUKA (3) |
16 | 08361710 | RAJESH KUMAR CHOTIA (2) |
17 | 08729717 | RHEA DINESH PODDAR (3) |
18 | 08882779 | ARYAN RAJESH PODDAR (3) |
19 | 09637477 | PRABHAT DINESH PODDAR (3) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.