As on : September 20,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000164182
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | ASHIRWAD CAPITAL LIMITED | L51900MH1985PLC036117 | 23-08-2019 | 05-03-1985 | ₹4,00,00,000 | |
2 | SWASTI VINAYAKA ART AND HERITAGE CORPORATION LIMITED | L51900MH1985PLC036536 | 01-04-2010 | 06-10-1985 | ₹4,00,00,000 | |
3 | SWASTI VINAYAKA SYNTHETICS LIMITED | L99999MH1981PLC024041 | 29-09-1986 | 03-09-1981 | ₹7,00,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00143438 | RAKESH KUMAR GARODIA (7) |
2 | 00164011 | RAJESH RAMPRASAD PODDAR (3) |
3 | 00164141 | SHILPA DINESH PODDAR (3) |
4 | 00164182 | DINESH PODDAR RAMPRASAD (3) |
5 | 00175621 | MADHUSUDAN LOHIA (6) |
6 | 00381643 | SANJIV VISHWANATH RUNGTA (3) |
7 | 08729717 | RHEA DINESH PODDAR (3) |
8 | 08882779 | ARYAN RAJESH PODDAR (3) |
9 | 09637477 | PRABHAT DINESH PODDAR (3) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.