As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0003091433
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | ACUMEN COMMOTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED | U51909WB2011PTC161212 | 22-07-2011 | 25-03-2011 | ₹6,10,000 | |
2 | HIRANYAGARBHA INFRASTRUCTURES PRIVATE LIMITED | U70102WB2015PTC207687 | 31-05-2016 | 03-09-2015 | ₹1,00,000 | |
3 | HQ CAPITAL ADVISORY LLP | AAB-7403 | 30-09-2016 | 03-09-2013 | ₹1,00,000 | |
4 | JAYANTI ENCLAVE PRIVATE LIMITED | U70109WB2011PTC165815 | 03-08-2011 | 08-03-2011 | ₹10,00,000 | |
5 | JAYANTI INFRADEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED | U70109WB2011PTC165812 | 03-08-2011 | 08-03-2011 | ₹10,00,000 | |
6 | JAYANTI INFRAPROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED | U70109WB2011PTC165816 | 03-08-2011 | 08-03-2011 | ₹5,87,500 | |
7 | JAYANTI PLAZZA PRIVATE LIMITED | U70109WB2011PTC165824 | 03-08-2011 | 08-03-2011 | ₹8,80,000 | |
8 | JAYANTI PROMOTERS PRIVATE LIMITED | U70109WB2011PTC165819 | 03-08-2011 | 08-03-2011 | ₹8,80,000 | |
9 | JEEVANMITRA DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED | U51109WB2010PTC148161 | 13-06-2018 | 17-05-2010 | ₹1,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00346345 | BINOD KUMAR DROLIA (13) |
2 | 00743441 | SANTOSH KUMAR SAHAL (5) |
3 | 01150081 | AMIT AGARWAL (3) |
4 | 02748655 | ABHISHEK ROONGTA (9) |
5 | 03091433 | VINEET DROLIA (9) |
6 | 03521052 | PUSHPAL MUKHERJEE (1) |
7 | 05211399 | HANS RAJ JAIN (5) |
8 | 07029892 | VIPUL DASHORA (3) |
9 | 07642860 | OMANA SUGATHAN (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.