As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0001150081
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | CATALYST EDUCARE LLP | AAW-9832 | 11-05-2021 | 11-05-2021 | ₹10,08,000 | |
2 | CENTAURI ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED | U74110WB2007PTC113892 | 23-02-2021 | 05-03-2007 | ₹8,40,000 | |
3 | HQ CAPITAL ADVISORY LLP | AAB-7403 | 21-04-2021 | 03-09-2013 | ₹1,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 01150011 | KAMAL KUMAR AGARWAL (2) |
2 | 01150061 | RAJ KUMAR AGARWAL (1) |
3 | 01150081 | AMIT AGARWAL (3) |
4 | 01150243 | TULSI RAM AGARWAL (4) |
5 | 03075496 | MANISHA SINGHAL (1) |
6 | 03091433 | VINEET DROLIA (9) |
7 | 03521052 | PUSHPAL MUKHERJEE (1) |
8 | 06560198 | ACHIN AGARWAL (6) |
9 | 07642860 | OMANA SUGATHAN (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.