As on : September 20,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000751001
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | BSR & CO. LLP | AAB-8181 | 01-08-2015 | 14-10-2013 | ₹16,95,36,612 | |
2 | FAMOUS AGENCIES LLP | AAD-1241 | 30-12-2014 | 30-12-2014 | ₹1,00,000 | |
3 | FDC LIMITED | L24239MH1940PLC003176 | 14-07-2023 | 23-09-1940 | ₹17,78,33,084 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00042332 | NOMITA RAMDAS CHANDAVARKAR (2) |
2 | 00042719 | ASHOK ANAND CHANDAVARKAR (5) |
3 | 00043238 | AMEYA ASHOK CHANDAVARKAR (5) |
4 | 00043344 | MOHAN CHANDAVARKAR ANAND (2) |
5 | 00043511 | NANDAN MOHAN CHANDAVARKAR (4) |
6 | 00245261 | SWATI SANDESH MAYEKAR (5) |
7 | 00398931 | PATRICIA VIJAY BHATT (1) |
8 | 00750905 | VIJAY MANIAR (2) |
9 | 00751001 | VIJAY NAUTAMLAL BHATT (3) |
10 | 00792123 | MELARKODE GANESAN PARAMESWARAN (2) |
11 | 01709499 | RAJIV GOYAL (2) |
12 | 01749610 | UDAY KUMAR GURKAR (2) |
13 | 02871283 | AKHIL BANSAL (1) |
14 | 02939466 | SHIRAZ AZIZ VASTANI (1) |
15 | 03576792 | JAYANTA MUKHOPADHYAY (1) |
16 | 03600340 | YEZDI BEHRAM NAGPOREWALLA (1) |
17 | 03627116 | PRAVIN MURARILAL TULSYAN (1) |
18 | 06517876 | USHA ATHREYA CHANDRASEKHAR (1) |
19 | 06525007 | SANJIV KUMAR CHAUDHARY (1) |
20 | 06653464 | KAUSHAL KISHORE (1) |
21 | 06791291 | JITEN CHOPRA (1) |
22 | 06797228 | AKEEL ABBAS MASTER (1) |
23 | 07099095 | HIMANSHU LALITKUMAR CHAPSEY (1) |
24 | 07615862 | CHINNASAMY GANESAN (2) |
25 | 08447258 | MAHESH CHANDRU BIJLANI (1) |
26 | 09163033 | VIKRAM ADVANI (1) |
27 | 09187223 | JAMIL AHMED KHATRI (2) |
28 | 09464416 | SHWETA KUMAR (1) |
29 | 09751679 | SADASHIV SHANKAR SHETTY (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.