As on : September 22,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0001510505
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | ACCORD WECS INDIA LLP | AAA-6644 | 20-10-2011 | 20-10-2011 | ₹0 | |
2 | INTELLVISIONS SOFTWARE LIMITED | L72200MH1995PLC176087 | 18-10-2011 | 08-04-1995 | ₹11,41,00,000 | |
3 | RIDDHI SIDDHI INFRASTRUCTURE LLP | AAB-9597 | 26-12-2013 | 26-12-2013 | ₹1,00,000 | |
4 | TRANSWARRANTY FINANCE LIMITED | L65920MH1994PLC080220 | 19-09-2016 | 08-09-1994 | ₹24,46,05,680 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00166916 | SHAILESH GHISULAL HINGARH (2) |
2 | 00233245 | AJAY DILKUSH SARUPRIA (2) |
3 | 00320541 | KUMAR NAIR (5) |
4 | 00493707 | RAMACHANDRAN UNNIKRISHNAN (2) |
5 | 00506837 | SANJAY RAMESH KOHLI (1) |
6 | 00681508 | GOPALAKRISHNAN BALAKRISHNA (2) |
7 | 00771506 | RAJAN CHARANDAS KAPOOR (2) |
8 | 00929820 | AASHISH VIJAY VYAS (1) |
9 | 01175664 | RISHI JAIN (3) |
10 | 01497453 | PARESH JAYAKRISHNA PATEL (3) |
11 | 01510505 | SUDHARSHANAN SUNDERASWARAN NAIR (4) |
12 | 02211111 | RAJ BALGANGADHAR MENON (1) |
13 | 02425468 | PRAVIN DHAIRYASHIL KHATAU (1) |
14 | 07149007 | NIRMALA SACHIN PARAB (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.