As on : September 22,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000493707
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | TRANSWARRANTY FINANCE LIMITED | L65920MH1994PLC080220 | 11-09-2015 | 08-09-1994 | ₹24,46,05,680 | |
2 | VERTEX SECURITIES LIMITED | L67120KL1993PLC007349 | 21-05-2016 | 15-09-1993 | ₹15,02,83,300 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00320541 | KUMAR NAIR (5) |
2 | 00493707 | RAMACHANDRAN UNNIKRISHNAN (2) |
3 | 00681508 | GOPALAKRISHNAN BALAKRISHNA (2) |
4 | 01049189 | JOSE THOMAS POLACHIRA (1) |
5 | 01510505 | SUDHARSHANAN SUNDERASWARAN NAIR (4) |
6 | 01976386 | GEORGE JOSEPH MAMPILLIL (1) |
7 | 02425468 | PRAVIN DHAIRYASHIL KHATAU (1) |
8 | 02492330 | JAMES POTHEN (1) |
9 | 06404421 | LATHA ANAND (1) |
10 | 07149007 | NIRMALA SACHIN PARAB (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.