As on : September 23,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0009734308
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | ALIFEROUS PMCS LLP | ACB-2553 | 19-05-2023 | 19-05-2023 | ₹10,000 | |
2 | LEGEND INFOWAYS LIMITED | U72300MH2007PLC355903 | 14-09-2022 | 05-02-2007 | ₹11,61,50,000 | |
3 | SUNSHINE CAPITAL LIMITED | L65993DL1994PLC060154 | 22-09-2023 | 07-11-1994 | ₹13,02,09,000 | |
4 | TRANS GLOBE NKS HOLDINGS LIMITED | U65993DL2006PLC156860 | 28-10-2023 | 21-12-2006 | ₹11,92,10,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00530035 | SURENDRA KUMAR JAIN (3) |
2 | 00530078 | VIRENDRA JAIN (2) |
3 | 00537234 | PRITI JAIN (2) |
4 | 02793128 | RAM KUMAR MISHRA (1) |
5 | 06786614 | DEEPU SINGH (1) |
6 | 06933359 | DEEPAK KUMAR BHOJAK (4) |
7 | 07016552 | BHUPENDRA KAUSHIK (8) |
8 | 07546484 | REKHA BHANDARI (2) |
9 | 09733008 | VIVEK SHARMA (3) |
10 | 09734308 | SUBODH KUMAR (4) |
11 | 09735554 | PROMILA SHARMA (4) |
12 | 09738086 | RICHA ARORA (1) |
13 | 10234983 | SHIVAM AGARWAL (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.