As on : September 23,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0006933359
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | EURO ASIA INDIA CORPORATION PRIVATE LIMITED | U74140MH2010PTC351822 | 20-06-2020 | 22-03-2010 | ₹4,81,00,000 | |
2 | GUNNY AUTO AND FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED | U74899MH1989PTC351823 | 20-06-2020 | 03-08-1989 | ₹10,01,98,500 | |
3 | LEGEND INFOWAYS LIMITED | U72300MH2007PLC355903 | 18-09-2014 | 05-02-2007 | ₹11,61,50,000 | |
4 | SHALINI HOLDINGS LIMITED | L65929DL1985PLC021037 | 10-11-2018 | 25-05-1985 | ₹12,74,80,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00537325 | RAMESH KUMAR (1) |
2 | 06932489 | MUKESH SAH (2) |
3 | 06933359 | DEEPAK KUMAR BHOJAK (4) |
4 | 07016552 | BHUPENDRA KAUSHIK (8) |
5 | 07543296 | DHARMENDRA GUPTA (2) |
6 | 07653949 | SANJAY BHATNAGAR (1) |
7 | 09211414 | TUSHAR RAI SHARMA (5) |
8 | 09733008 | VIVEK SHARMA (3) |
9 | 09734308 | SUBODH KUMAR (4) |
10 | 09735554 | PROMILA SHARMA (4) |
11 | 09738086 | RICHA ARORA (1) |
12 | 10153909 | PRERNA SINGH (4) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.