As on : September 22,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0010195191
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | ANSHUNI COMMERCIALS LIMITED | L90000MH1984PLC034879 | 12-01-2024 | 22-12-1984 | ₹24,00,000 | |
2 | NIBE AERONAUTICS LIMITED | U77307MH2024PLC418445 | 02-02-2024 | 02-02-2024 | ₹5,00,000 | |
3 | NIBE LIMITED | L34100PN2005PLC205813 | 23-09-2023 | 18-10-2005 | ₹13,13,21,850 | |
4 | NIBE MESON NAVAL LIMITED | U33122MH2024PLC416486 | 01-01-2024 | 01-01-2024 | ₹10,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00083262 | RANJANA MANOJ MIMANI (2) |
2 | 00527214 | RAHUL JHUNJHUNWALA (4) |
3 | 02397209 | GAURAV BRAHMDEV THAKUR (1) |
4 | 02932622 | GANESH RAMESH NIBE (7) |
5 | 05154847 | BRIJESH MADHAV MANERIKAR (1) |
6 | 05154850 | SWAROOP RAGHUVIR NATEKAR (1) |
7 | 06702073 | MAHESH PANWAR (4) |
8 | 06740979 | GOUTAM GUPTA (2) |
9 | 07621289 | DIPESH GARG (5) |
10 | 07628039 | VENKATESWARA GOWTAMA MANNAVA (5) |
11 | 07636054 | PRIYESH GARG (4) |
12 | 08686236 | BHAGWAN KRISHNA GADADE (1) |
13 | 10131317 | DASHARATH RAM (1) |
14 | 10195191 | SOONIL V BHOKARE (4) |
15 | 10377934 | SHILPA AJAY BHATIA (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.