As on : September 23,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000370988
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | ADISHWAR NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED | U70200WB2004PTC098889 | 25-09-2009 | 18-06-2004 | ₹27,42,000 | |
2 | GREENPLAS TECH LLP | AAS-3592 | 18-04-2020 | 18-04-2020 | ₹1,00,000 | |
3 | GRIDLYNK SOLAR LLP | AAK-9481 | 29-05-2020 | 25-10-2017 | ₹1,00,000 | |
4 | MAYUR COMMEX LLP | ACE-8976 | 15-01-2024 | 15-01-2024 | ₹2,11,00,000 | |
5 | MAYUR COMMEX PRIVATE LIMITED | U51109RJ2004PTC019905 | 01-12-2005 | 18-11-2004 | ₹1,00,000 | |
6 | RAMDAS PHARMACEUTICALS PRIVATE LIMITED | U24110HR2020PTC086562 | 05-06-2020 | 05-06-2020 | ₹1,00,000 |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.