As on : September 22,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000126309
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | BEW ENGINEERING LIMITED | L74120MH2011PLC216096 | 31-03-2021 | 04-11-2011 | ₹1,00,00,000 | |
2 | DUCOL ORGANICS AND COLOURS LIMITED | U24239MH1994PLC079015 | 01-06-2022 | 16-06-1994 | ₹14,54,00,000 | |
3 | TRANSWARRANTY CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED | U65999MH2017PTC292889 | 23-03-2017 | 23-03-2017 | ₹4,00,000 | |
4 | TRANSWARRANTY FOREX AND COMMODITIES PRIVATE LIMITED | U65990MH1996PTC101904 | 27-12-2004 | 16-08-1996 | ₹4,80,05,975 | |
5 | VAIDYA SANE AYURVED LABORATORIES LIMITED | L73100PN1999PLC013509 | 13-09-2021 | 04-06-1999 | ₹4,50,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00126309 | RATNAKAR VENKAPPA RAI (5) |
2 | 00131833 | ROBY SASIDHARAN SADANAM (2) |
3 | 00320541 | KUMAR NAIR (5) |
4 | 00460811 | ROHAN PRAKASH LADE (2) |
5 | 00503310 | HARIDAS RAMAN THRITHAMARSERY VARIEATH (4) |
6 | 00679851 | ROHIT MADHAV SANE (1) |
7 | 00711705 | AAMER AHMED FARID (2) |
8 | 00711968 | HANI AHMED FARID (2) |
9 | 02122493 | PRAKASH BHALCHANDRA LADE (2) |
10 | 06362676 | RAVIKANT MORESHWAR MHATRE (3) |
11 | 06795550 | SUSHRUT RAGHAVENDRA DAMBAL (2) |
12 | 07504319 | YOGESH KHAKRE (1) |
13 | 07612577 | MAHESH PANDURANGRAO KSHIRSAGAR (6) |
14 | 07761375 | RAVIRAJA SANJEEVA POOJARY (1) |
15 | 09137915 | SHEELA PRAKASH LADE (1) |
16 | 09299252 | VIDYUT BIPIN GHAG (1) |
17 | 09359208 | SHIVANI SHIVSHANKAR TIWARI (3) |
18 | 09624370 | ABHISHEK AGRAWAL (4) |
19 | 10130251 | SANGITA BHAMESH KAMBLE (3) |
20 | AAPPQ4213L | SABINA BEE MOHAMMED SHAHID QURESHI (1) |
21 | CDSPM3027L | MANISHA AGRAWAL (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.