As on : September 22,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0009624370
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | BEW ENGINEERING LIMITED | L74120MH2011PLC216096 | 19-02-2024 | 04-11-2011 | ₹1,00,00,000 | |
2 | DUCOL ORGANICS AND COLOURS LIMITED | U24239MH1994PLC079015 | 01-06-2022 | 16-06-1994 | ₹14,54,00,000 | |
3 | PARAMATRIX TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED | U72200MH2004PLC144890 | 17-01-2024 | 03-08-2004 | ₹31,00,000 | |
4 | SHREE OSFM E-MOBILITY LIMITED | U93090MH2006PLC166545 | 30-06-2023 | 28-12-2006 | ₹50,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00126309 | RATNAKAR VENKAPPA RAI (5) |
2 | 00139960 | MUKESH THUMAR KESHUBHAI (2) |
3 | 00460811 | ROHAN PRAKASH LADE (2) |
4 | 00711705 | AAMER AHMED FARID (2) |
5 | 00711968 | HANI AHMED FARID (2) |
6 | 01322558 | BHAVNA MUKESH THUMAR (1) |
7 | 01877280 | RAMNATH CHANDAR PATIL (1) |
8 | 01879334 | NITIN BHAGIRATH SHANBHAG (1) |
9 | 02122493 | PRAKASH BHALCHANDRA LADE (2) |
10 | 06362676 | RAVIKANT MORESHWAR MHATRE (3) |
11 | 06541786 | MAHESH PANDURANG GORIWALE (1) |
12 | 07504319 | YOGESH KHAKRE (1) |
13 | 09137915 | SHEELA PRAKASH LADE (1) |
14 | 09359208 | SHIVANI SHIVSHANKAR TIWARI (3) |
15 | 09624370 | ABHISHEK AGRAWAL (4) |
16 | 10130251 | SANGITA BHAMESH KAMBLE (3) |
17 | AAPPQ4213L | SABINA BEE MOHAMMED SHAHID QURESHI (1) |
18 | CDSPM3027L | MANISHA AGRAWAL (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.