As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0003107155
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | PRAPTI CONSTRUCTIONS AND REAL ESTATE LLP | AAB-1364 | 26-09-2012 | 26-09-2012 | ₹1,00,000 | |
2 | PRAPTI MULTITRADE PRIVATE LIMITED | U51101MH2000PTC126555 | 07-06-2000 | 16-05-2000 | ₹1,00,000 | |
3 | SPARSH FINVEST INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED | U65923MH2013PTC249207 | 14-10-2013 | 14-10-2013 | ₹1,00,000 | |
4 | ZARINE PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED | U70102MH2010PTC206386 | 05-03-2013 | 08-09-2010 | ₹1,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00778500 | GHEVERCHAND RIKHABCHAND JAIN (2) |
2 | 00819500 | MAYANK SHOBHAGCHAND VARIA (6) |
3 | 01322250 | DILIP RAJPAL HARIA (1) |
4 | 02291432 | YOGESH TULSIDAS SHAH (2) |
5 | 03107155 | RAJENDRA DHARAMSI DAVE (4) |
6 | 03142142 | ALPESH KANTILAL SHAH (1) |
7 | 06533194 | GIRJASHANKAR RAMNARESH PANDEY (1) |
8 | 06533253 | JAYESH KRISHNAJI SHIRKE (1) |
9 | 06533270 | JYOTI SHARMA (1) |
10 | 06533279 | SANJAY SINGH (1) |
11 | 06590354 | VIRAL PRAKASH SAVLA (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.