As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000819500
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | PRAPTI CONSTRUCTIONS AND REAL ESTATE LLP | AAB-1364 | 26-09-2012 | 26-09-2012 | ₹1,00,000 | |
2 | PRAPTI MULTITRADE PRIVATE LIMITED | U51101MH2000PTC126555 | 07-06-2000 | 16-05-2000 | ₹1,00,000 | |
3 | RUCHIRA REALTORS LLP | AAB-1668 | 15-10-2012 | 15-10-2012 | ₹1,00,000 | |
4 | TEXAS LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED | U24200MH1980PTC022649 | 19-06-2020 | 16-05-1980 | ₹10,00,000 | |
5 | TEXAS LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED | U24200MH1980PTC022649 | 31-12-2020 | 16-05-1980 | ₹10,00,000 | |
6 | VIKUNJ ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED | U65920MH1996PTC104547 | 24-01-2007 | 17-12-1996 | ₹75,00,000 | |
7 | VITRAG REALETORS PRIVATE LIMITED | U30000MH1995PTC094134 | 05-10-2006 | 11-02-1995 | ₹6,00,200 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00272762 | PARAS TARACHAND JAIN (3) |
2 | 00819500 | MAYANK SHOBHAGCHAND VARIA (6) |
3 | 01722767 | NIRAJ VORA JAYANTILAL (3) |
4 | 02054944 | BHAGWATIPRASAD RAMSHARAN AGARWAL (1) |
5 | 02291432 | YOGESH TULSIDAS SHAH (2) |
6 | 02425062 | NARESHKUMAR CHUNILALJI PARMAR (3) |
7 | 03107155 | RAJENDRA DHARAMSI DAVE (4) |
8 | 03142142 | ALPESH KANTILAL SHAH (1) |
9 | 05264862 | MADHUMATI VINOD MEHTA (1) |
10 | 10371706 | MAITREE VARIA (2) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.