As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000851648
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | GRILOW ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED | U70109MH2018PTC317597 | 29-11-2018 | 29-11-2018 | ₹100 | |
2 | INDIA INTERNATIONAL INFRASTRUCTURE ENGIN | AAF-8846 | 09-03-2016 | 09-03-2016 | ₹6,04,00,000 | |
3 | SHRIKHANDE AREN CONSULTING PRIVATE LIMITED | U74120MH2012PTC228804 | 28-03-2012 | 28-03-2012 | ₹10,00,000 | |
4 | SHRIKHANDE CONSULTANTS LIMITED | U74210MH1978PLC020860 | 11-01-2021 | 28-12-1978 | ₹50,00,000 | |
5 | STB CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED | U74200MH2001PTC133522 | 01-10-2001 | 10-01-2001 | ₹5,10,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00019169 | ULHAS SHOORSEN KALGUTKAR (1) |
2 | 00200167 | AJAY ARJUNLAL AGARWAL (2) |
3 | 00833655 | RAVINDRA NEELKANTH SHRIKHANDE (4) |
4 | 00851648 | RAJEEV NILKANTH SHRIKHANDE (5) |
5 | 00867055 | ATUL DAMODAR BHOBE (1) |
6 | 02008372 | ANAND SURYAKANT CHALWADE (3) |
7 | 02383105 | PRABODA KASHINATH MANOHAR (1) |
8 | 02701870 | PIERO GUIZZETTI (4) |
9 | 05288655 | RAVI VISHNU RAJAN (2) |
10 | 05315775 | DAVIDE SAVOINO (1) |
11 | 06730001 | RASHMI RANJAN MOHANTY (1) |
12 | 07079209 | ARCHANA GIRISH LAKHE (1) |
13 | 09428208 | HITESH NATHULAL SARDESAI (1) |
14 | 09428257 | VASUDHA VASANT DANGARE (1) |
15 | 10042770 | RENUKA RAJEEV SHRIKHANDE (1) |
16 | 10042811 | MEDHA RAVINDRA SHRIKHANDE (1) |
17 | 10043020 | ARUNDHATI RAJEEV SHRIKHANDE (4) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.