As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0002008372
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | ESSEL ENTERTAINMENT MEDIA LIMITED | U92190MH2007PLC177148 | 04-07-2008 | 27-12-2007 | ₹70,00,00,000 | |
2 | FLOREM MULTIVENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED | U74110MH2017PTC292777 | 19-08-2017 | 21-03-2017 | ₹1,00,000 | |
3 | SHRIKHANDE CONSULTANTS LIMITED | U74210MH1978PLC020860 | 30-09-2019 | 28-12-1978 | ₹50,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00017707 | AMIT GOENKA (2) |
2 | 00200167 | AJAY ARJUNLAL AGARWAL (2) |
3 | 00686830 | HIMANSHU MODY (1) |
4 | 00833655 | RAVINDRA NEELKANTH SHRIKHANDE (4) |
5 | 00851648 | RAJEEV NILKANTH SHRIKHANDE (5) |
6 | 02008372 | ANAND SURYAKANT CHALWADE (3) |
7 | 06610170 | SUDAM GOVIND RAJIWADE (2) |
8 | 07079209 | ARCHANA GIRISH LAKHE (1) |
9 | 07896988 | GUNJAN MUNDRA (1) |
10 | 09428208 | HITESH NATHULAL SARDESAI (1) |
11 | 09428257 | VASUDHA VASANT DANGARE (1) |
12 | 10043020 | ARUNDHATI RAJEEV SHRIKHANDE (4) |
13 | AJOPA3622K | DHAVAL GIRISH ASHAR (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.