As on : September 23,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000922257
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | AISHWARAYAM REALITY LLP | AAI-1581 | 03-01-2017 | 03-01-2017 | ₹1,00,000 | |
2 | ALOKIK BUILDERS LIMITED | U01135RJ1995PLC009500 | 30-09-2011 | 13-02-1995 | ₹47,72,680 | |
3 | AMER VALLEY RESORT LLP | AAF-2490 | 01-12-2015 | 01-12-2015 | ₹2,10,00,000 | |
4 | BUILDERS ALLIANCE PRIVATE LIMITED | U45201RJ1992PTC006421 | 20-08-2021 | 01-01-1992 | ₹65,75,200 | |
5 | EXPERTA MEDICA PVT LTD | U24232RJ1978PTC001796 | 01-10-2021 | 27-06-1978 | ₹22,98,500 | |
6 | POWAI AGRO INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED | U01100MH1974PTC017523 | 20-01-1998 | 06-10-1974 | ₹1,00,000 | |
7 | SDV ESTATES LLP | AAE-5003 | 04-08-2015 | 04-08-2015 | ₹1,00,000 | |
8 | SHREE KRISHNA VATIKA HOMES LLP | AAD-6563 | 28-03-2015 | 28-03-2015 | ₹1,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00036468 | VINAY JOSHI (10) |
2 | 00093506 | OM PRAKASH MODI (5) |
3 | 00093547 | VIJAY KRISHNA MODI (8) |
4 | 00128263 | OM PRAKASH GOYAL (9) |
5 | 00144681 | SUNDER DAS SONKIA (10) |
6 | 00172379 | ATUL KRISHNA MODI (11) |
7 | 00174653 | AJAY KRISHNA MODI (11) |
8 | 00519392 | ANURAG SHARMA (6) |
9 | 00519485 | BHAWANI SHANKAR SHARMA (2) |
10 | 00665068 | SANDEEP BHARDWAJ (3) |
11 | 00922257 | DIKSHANT GOPAL SHARMA (8) |
12 | 00936113 | PRASHANT GOPAL SHARMA (4) |
13 | 01289389 | VIJAY SHANKAR TIWARI (2) |
14 | 01975966 | ARVIND MISHRA (1) |
15 | 02327207 | YOGENDRA PRATAP SINGH (2) |
16 | 03243612 | NUPUR SAREEN (3) |
17 | 03530523 | AYUB KHAN (1) |
18 | 06822803 | YUGANK DIKSHANT SHARMA (9) |
19 | 06867501 | GURNAM SINGH (1) |
20 | 07340985 | SOMENDRA SHARMA (1) |
21 | 07341664 | GOPAL LAL MALPANI (1) |
22 | 07348117 | SUNIT KUMAR SHAH (1) |
23 | 07679869 | ASHISH KUMAR SHARMA (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.