As on : September 23,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000174653
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | GOVINDVATIKA REALTORS LLP | AAC-0248 | 24-01-2014 | 24-01-2014 | ₹16,00,000 | |
2 | OKAY PLUS BUILDERS LLP | AAD-6350 | 26-03-2015 | 26-03-2015 | ₹15,00,00,000 | |
3 | OKAY PLUS INTERNATIONAL LIMITED | L45201RJ1993PLC007831 | 30-07-2020 | 22-11-1993 | ₹4,12,60,000 | |
4 | OKAY PLUS JKD BUILDMART LLP | AAD-5960 | 23-03-2015 | 23-03-2015 | ₹5,00,000 | |
5 | OPG BUILDING MAINTENANCE LLP | AAD-6095 | 24-03-2015 | 24-03-2015 | ₹1,00,000 | |
6 | RUBY SUITES LLP | ABZ-9405 | 30-01-2023 | 30-01-2023 | ₹1,00,000 | |
7 | SHREE KRISHNA VATIKA BUILDWELL LLP | AAC-7841 | 07-10-2014 | 07-10-2014 | ₹9,89,000 | |
8 | SHREE KRISHNA VATIKA CITY LLP | AAC-3493 | 05-10-2018 | 05-06-2014 | ₹1,00,000 | |
9 | SHREE KRISHNA VATIKA HOMES LLP | AAD-6563 | 28-03-2015 | 28-03-2015 | ₹1,00,000 | |
10 | SRK HOSPITALITY PRIVATE LIMITED | U55101RJ2023PTC086302 | 14-03-2023 | 30-04-2012 | ₹1,00,000 | |
11 | SRK HOSPITALITY PRIVATE LIMITED | U55101RJ2023PTC086302 | 14-03-2023 | 14-03-2023 | ₹1,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00093506 | OM PRAKASH MODI (5) |
2 | 00093547 | VIJAY KRISHNA MODI (8) |
3 | 00128263 | OM PRAKASH GOYAL (9) |
4 | 00172316 | SNEH LATA MODI (3) |
5 | 00172344 | SAPNA MODI (2) |
6 | 00172363 | RADHIKA MODI (2) |
7 | 00172379 | ATUL KRISHNA MODI (11) |
8 | 00174653 | AJAY KRISHNA MODI (11) |
9 | 00542463 | RITESH AGARWAL (20) |
10 | 00922257 | DIKSHANT GOPAL SHARMA (8) |
11 | 01795803 | SHILPA MODI (2) |
12 | 01921461 | SUSHILA DEVI AGARWAL (1) |
13 | 02355623 | SUMIT GUPTA (1) |
14 | 07742132 | MAHESH ADVANI (4) |
15 | 10041049 | SHARAD JAIN (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.