As on : September 20,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000267604
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | AARTI PHARMALABS LIMITED | L24100GJ2019PLC110964 | 10-01-2023 | 22-11-2019 | ₹25,00,000 | |
2 | B Y & ASSOCIATES LIMITED LIABILITY PARTN ERSHIP | AAD-4194 | 21-02-2015 | 21-02-2015 | ₹5,00,000 | |
3 | BASILSTONE CONSULTING PRIVATE LIMITED | U74999MH2020PTC348910 | 28-10-2020 | 28-10-2020 | ₹1,00,000 | |
4 | SABERO ORGANICS GUJARAT LIMITED | L24110GJ1991PLC020753 | 18-07-2014 | 29-11-1991 | ₹33,85,10,970 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00005499 | HETAL GOGRI GALA (13) |
2 | 00009272 | PARIMAL HASMUKHLAL DESAI (2) |
3 | 00026460 | MOHAN KRISHNA TANDON (4) |
4 | 00030719 | YATIN KIRTANLAL DESAI (3) |
5 | 00033383 | VILAS GAIKAR GAJANAN (1) |
6 | 00061003 | RAJENDRA VALLABHAJI GOGRI (12) |
7 | 00066291 | RASHESH CHANDRAKANT GOGRI (14) |
8 | 00110086 | VENKATACHALAM RAVICHANDRAN (2) |
9 | 00114611 | VEERA BHADRAM GARIMELLA (2) |
10 | 00152619 | MURUGAPPAN MUTHIAH VENKATACHALAM (9) |
11 | 00267604 | BHAVESH RASIKLAL VORA (4) |
12 | 00299202 | NARENDRA JAGANNATH SALVI (2) |
13 | 01215092 | KAPIL MEHAN (3) |
14 | 02577389 | VINAY GOPAL NAYAK (1) |
15 | 07094719 | NAVIN JAIN RATANCHAND (2) |
16 | 07095760 | JINESH MANGILAL JAIN (1) |
17 | 07096253 | RUPAL ANAND VORA (4) |
18 | 07096505 | HIREN NARENDRA MEHTA (1) |
19 | 07096532 | AMEYA SHRIKRISHNA THAKURDESAI (1) |
20 | 07545244 | JEENAL KENIL SAVLA (2) |
21 | 10044411 | KUNAL VIJAY MEHTA (1) |
22 | 10044672 | KHUSHBU DEVESH SHAH (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.