As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0008648423
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | ENERGY FOOD BASKET PRIVATE LIMITED | U56290TZ2024PTC030356 | 10-01-2024 | 10-01-2024 | ₹1,00,000 | |
2 | FOBAS MART PRIVATE LIMITED | U56290TZ2023PTC030285 | 30-12-2023 | 30-12-2023 | ₹1,00,000 | |
3 | NEPTUNE GREEN ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED | U34202TZ2019PTC033208 | 24-12-2019 | 24-12-2019 | ₹1,00,000 | |
4 | NEPTUNEGREEN KISSAN AGRO TECH PRIVATE LIMITED | U15332TZ2021PTC037464 | 02-11-2021 | 02-11-2021 | ₹1,00,000 | |
5 | NUQ ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED | U34300TN2022PTC155455 | 19-09-2022 | 19-09-2022 | ₹3,00,000 | |
6 | NUQ MOTORS PRIVATE LIMITED | U34100TN2022PTC155378 | 15-09-2022 | 15-09-2022 | ₹3,00,000 | |
7 | SHIVADHAN INFRATECH PRIVATE LIMITED | U45400TG2021PTC156666 | 20-07-2022 | 08-11-2021 | ₹1,00,000 | |
8 | UI3X CUBE HYGIENE GHAZIPUR PRIVATELIMITED | U90000DL2022PTC407342 | 05-10-2023 | 24-11-2022 | ₹1,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00477998 | RAM KUMAR TALLURI (8) |
2 | 00541535 | RAMESH JAIN (2) |
3 | 02741074 | SAHEER HARUN HARUN (4) |
4 | 02777881 | VISHAL VAIBHAV (4) |
5 | 08234793 | JAY KUMAR (5) |
6 | 08357367 | SIVASUBRAMANIAM KRISHNAMURTHY (4) |
7 | 08648423 | ZAKRIYA AZAD (8) |
8 | 08648425 | KOWSALYARAM RAJARAM SURESH (1) |
9 | 08701270 | ABDUL BARI EMILY (1) |
10 | 09385364 | N HAJIRA (1) |
11 | 09389107 | VISHNUVARDHANRAO CHERUKURI (2) |
12 | 09389108 | SHIVA PRASAD KONDA (3) |
13 | 09652732 | MAHIMA (3) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.