As on : September 22,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0002656890
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | SPRY ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED | U40109TG2009PTC064059 | 30-09-2010 | 19-06-2009 | ₹1,00,000 | |
2 | SRECKO INDHAN LIMITED | U74999TG2007PLC052461 | 22-05-2009 | 23-01-2007 | ₹25,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 01029801 | RAMESH BABU PUTTAGUNTA (1) |
2 | 01033874 | PRAVEEN KUMAR RAMINENI (1) |
3 | 01846001 | SRIHARI KORITALA (1) |
4 | 02019882 | VENKATA RAMA RAO NARLA (1) |
5 | 02478042 | PRASAD POLAVARAPU (8) |
6 | 02617990 | GOVARDHANA RAO ALLA (2) |
7 | 02656864 | RAGHAVENDER NAIKOTI (2) |
8 | 02656890 | VIVEK KESARI (2) |
9 | 05147890 | REDDYPALLY MAHENDAR (2) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.