As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000046973
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | ADELMO ADVISORS LLP | AAA-9158 | 10-07-2017 | 10-05-2012 | ₹1,00,000 | |
2 | DELLSTAR TRADING LLP | AAO-0781 | 18-01-2019 | 18-01-2019 | ₹1,00,000 | |
3 | DEVANSH ENTERPRISES LLP | AAJ-5077 | 24-05-2017 | 24-05-2017 | ₹1,00,000 | |
4 | DEVANSH VENTURES LIMITED LIABILITY PARTN ERSHIP | AAA-1656 | 24-06-2010 | 24-06-2010 | ₹ | |
5 | PEACH BLOSSOM COMMERCIAL LLP | AAB-7596 | 11-09-2013 | 11-09-2013 | ₹1,00,000 | |
6 | ROSE PEACH COMMERCIALS LLP | AAA-5478 | 18-10-2013 | 07-07-2011 | ₹0 | |
7 | SPACE SOLUTION DEVELOPERS & INFRA-LOGIST | AAF-9715 | 17-03-2016 | 17-03-2016 | ₹49,00,000 | |
8 | SPACE SOLUTION DEVELOPERS & INFRA-LOGISTICS PRIVATE LIMITED | U70102MH2008PTC177350 | 29-09-2012 | 01-04-2008 | ₹12,25,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00005499 | HETAL GOGRI GALA (13) |
2 | 00046973 | VIJAY MORARJI NANDU (8) |
3 | 00047016 | VIPUL RAMESH VIRA (6) |
4 | 00050003 | MUKESH DHIRAJLAL DEDHIA (6) |
5 | 00124603 | VARSHA RAJARAM GALVANKAR (2) |
6 | 00237937 | KIRAN ANIL SHAH (3) |
7 | 00310322 | PRITI DINESH GHALLA (4) |
8 | 00393923 | AMIT CHANDRAKANT GOSAR (2) |
9 | 02055879 | DEEPAK DHARSHI BHEDA (4) |
10 | 03210524 | ROHAN DINESH GHALLA (11) |
11 | 08631327 | PRIYANK MUKESH DEDHIA (2) |
12 | 08631328 | RUPAL MUKESH DEDHIA (4) |
13 | 09630354 | KALPANA HARESH CHHEDA (4) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.