As on : September 22,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000015132
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | GREEN FIRE AGRO TECH PRIVATE LIMITED | U01400TG2010PTC068764 | 03-06-2010 | 06-03-2010 | ₹1,00,000 | |
2 | SHAILI INFRA LIMITED | U45203TG2010PLC068210 | 04-11-2011 | 05-01-2010 | ₹12,90,79,200 | |
3 | VAR QUANT TECH SECURITIES PRIVATE LIMITED | U72900TG2008PTC061238 | 29-09-2008 | 29-09-2008 | ₹10,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00003933 | BHASKARA REDDY KUNAREDDY (3) |
2 | 00015132 | VENKAT SRINIVAS MEENAVALLI (3) |
3 | 02449906 | SRINIVASA RAO TATIPAKA (6) |
4 | 03013165 | DASIGI VENKATA SURYA PRAKASH RAO (1) |
5 | 03480609 | KIRAN REDDY VISIREDDY (2) |
6 | 06622408 | PINGILI SRUJITH REDDY (2) |
7 | 06783606 | GOVARDHAN REDDY DORNALA (2) |
8 | 07177166 | CHUKKA SIVA SATYA SRINIVAS (5) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.