As on : September 22,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0007328446
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | BIELO HOSPITALITY PRIVATE LIMITED | U56301TS2023PTC172351 | 31-05-2023 | 25-04-2023 | ₹10,00,000 | |
2 | PEACE LILY HOSPITALITY & ENTERTAINMENT LLP | ACE-7251 | 03-01-2024 | 03-01-2024 | ₹10,00,000 | |
3 | TASTE BUDDER'S HOSPITALITY PRIVATE LIMITED | U55209TG2022PTC160954 | 24-05-2022 | 26-03-2022 | ₹1,00,000 | |
4 | TRANSPIRE INFRA PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED | U70109TG2019PTC132207 | 22-04-2019 | 22-04-2019 | ₹10,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 05285041 | SANDESH REDDY BHAVANAM (2) |
2 | 05354142 | PUNUKOLLU SUMANTH (6) |
3 | 06699271 | ORUGANTI VENKAT SAMIR KUMAR (2) |
4 | 06699271 | SAMIR KUMAR VENKAT ORUGANTI (2) |
5 | 07232407 | NITEESH PRAMAODKUMAR TOKLE (4) |
6 | 07328446 | VARAKANTHAM SAI SWETHAN KUMAR (4) |
7 | 07412583 | SANDHYA REDDY BHAVANAM (1) |
8 | 08125506 | MOGILINENI BABA SAI DEERAJ (5) |
9 | 08495827 | ANEGONDI THANOJ KUMAR (3) |
10 | 08538264 | SRIDIVYA GAYATRI CHINTAPALLI (2) |
11 | 08572930 | RUDRARAJU RAMACHANDRA VARMA (4) |
12 | 08584445 | SRAVANI KODE (2) |
13 | 08791055 | KETAN AGARWAL (2) |
14 | 08886399 | DHARMA METHUSH SURAPANENI (2) |
15 | 09717141 | HARSHITHA KRISHNA REVANURU (1) |
16 | 10291589 | MADHARAPU SUDHIR (1) |
17 | 10291591 | MADI SHIREESH KUMAR REDDY (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.