As on : September 20,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0001581768
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | CANARA BANK SECURITIES LIMITED | U67120MH1996GOI097783 | 18-08-2022 | 03-01-1996 | ₹40,00,00,000 | |
2 | CENLUB INDUSTRIES LIMITED | L67120HR1992PLC035087 | 20-09-2022 | 26-03-1992 | ₹4,12,00,000 | |
3 | T A M S & CO LLP | ACA-7982 | 26-04-2023 | 26-04-2023 | ₹2,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00006418 | MADHU MITTAL (1) |
2 | 00006435 | AMAN MITTAL (1) |
3 | 00006490 | DINESH KAUSHAL (2) |
4 | 00041986 | ANSH MITTAL (1) |
5 | 00386511 | ASHOK KUMAR (1) |
6 | 01581768 | TARUN KUMAR GUPTA (3) |
7 | 08193978 | DEBASHISH MUKHERJEE (4) |
8 | 08441000 | SANTOSH VARMA (1) |
9 | 08754192 | KALYANI KOTA (1) |
10 | 09164982 | MAHESH MURALIDHAR PAI (2) |
11 | 09374026 | BIKRAM SINGH RAINA (1) |
12 | 10043991 | VENKATASUBRAMANIAN KALYAN (1) |
13 | 10134965 | MOHAN SONI (1) |
14 | 10249804 | DHANANJAY KUMAR SINHA (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.