As on : September 20,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0002124057
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 4S ASSETS LLP | AAS-4629 | 08-11-2022 | 22-05-2020 | ₹300 | |
2 | BAHETI INFRA PRIVATE LIMITED | U70109TG2012PTC079938 | 26-03-2012 | 26-03-2012 | ₹1,00,000 | |
3 | BAHETI STEEL TRADERS LLP | AAR-2455 | 06-12-2019 | 06-12-2019 | ₹2,00,000 | |
4 | MAHESH VIDYA BHAVAN LIMITED | U80101TG1994PLC017887 | 30-09-2022 | 07-08-1994 | ₹99,50,000 | |
5 | NIRMAL AVENUE PRIVATE LIMITED | U45200TG2008PTC058545 | 04-04-2008 | 04-04-2008 | ₹2,00,000 | |
6 | PARIN COMMODITIES PRIVATE LIMITED | U93000TG2008PTC062387 | 01-01-2009 | 30-12-2008 | ₹7,55,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00010968 | HARI NARAYAN RATHI (2) |
2 | 00082538 | RAJKUMAR MALPANI (7) |
3 | 00147869 | BUDHI TOSHNIWAL PRAKASH (7) |
4 | 00543942 | BIJAY KUMAR MANDHANI (6) |
5 | 00631538 | UMESH KUMAR RATHI (2) |
6 | 00805353 | LALCHAND BHANGDIA (1) |
7 | 00888191 | SAMIR BHAGAT (14) |
8 | 01511890 | HARISH CHANDRA GUPTA (2) |
9 | 01512129 | SUJATA GUPTA (2) |
10 | 01537251 | BHAGWATI DEVI BALDWA (1) |
11 | 01575274 | MAHAVEER LOHIYA (4) |
12 | 01859486 | DHANRAJ SONI (3) |
13 | 01969136 | KALPANA SUNIL JAIN (1) |
14 | 01969198 | JAYASHREE SHARDA (1) |
15 | 02118620 | ANITA BAHETI (1) |
16 | 02124057 | SHYAM SUNDER BAHETI (6) |
17 | 02260773 | RAMESH CHANDRA PARTHANI (4) |
18 | 03386882 | MURALINARAYAN RATHI (2) |
19 | 03386986 | MANOJ KUMAR BAHETI (7) |
20 | 03526592 | RAVI KANTH HEDA (3) |
21 | 05333556 | BONGU BUCHIDAS GOUD (2) |
22 | 06491373 | JAYASREE BONGU (1) |
23 | 07574501 | NANDGOPAL BHATTAD (1) |
24 | 08044458 | RAJESH KUMAR MUNDRA (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.