As on : September 20,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0002094645
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | AUM FUND ADVISORS LLP | AAC-5186 | 30-07-2014 | 30-07-2014 | ₹50,00,000 | |
2 | CITICORP FINANCE (INDIA) LIMITED | U65910MH1997PLC253897 | 28-01-2015 | 01-05-1997 | ₹28,93,29,52,032 | |
3 | GRP LIMITED | L25191GJ1974PLC002555 | 12-09-2017 | 29-06-1974 | ₹1,33,33,330 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00001811 | DEEPAK KESHAV GHAISAS (3) |
2 | 00002593 | ABHIJIT SEN (13) |
3 | 00003480 | ROHIT RANJAN (2) |
4 | 00021730 | RAJEEV MAHENDRA PANDIA (6) |
5 | 00114447 | VIVEK GUL ASRANI (4) |
6 | 00133091 | HARSH GANDHI (3) |
7 | 00138918 | NINA NAGPAL (2) |
8 | 00139786 | ANSHUL MITTAL (2) |
9 | 00144540 | SAMIR RAMESHCHANDRA PALOD (3) |
10 | 00189197 | RAJENDRA VADILAL GANDHI (2) |
11 | 00388405 | SAMEER KAUL (1) |
12 | 01375718 | ANURADHA CHOUDHURY (1) |
13 | 01444424 | HEMAL HARSH GANDHI (2) |
14 | 01815914 | ADITYAPURAM NARAYAN SWAMY SESHAN (1) |
15 | 02094645 | SAURABH SURENDRA SHAH (3) |
16 | 02717462 | PANKAJ SHARMA (1) |
17 | 03352971 | RAHUL SHUKLA (1) |
18 | 09367771 | RAJEEV VIJAY SHANKAR MANTRI (3) |
19 | AACPB3978L | RAKESH BAJAJ (1) |
20 | AAPPU3908A | SAMEER VISHNUPRASAD UPADHYAY (1) |
21 | AFWPM2496M | SHILPA NARENDRA MEHTA (1) |
22 | ALZPJ0508L | RUCHIT HASMUKHLAL JAIN (1) |
23 | AMUPB3921H | JYOTI SANCHETI (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.