As on : September 24,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0006915774
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | HARIKRIPA INFRA DEVELOPERS LLP | AAE-4087 | 20-07-2015 | 20-07-2015 | ₹1,00,000 | |
2 | KRISHNAM INFRAESTATE LLP | AAF-4898 | 13-01-2016 | 13-01-2016 | ₹1,00,000 | |
3 | KRISHNAM INFRAESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED | U70101RJ2012PTC039123 | 29-03-2014 | 06-06-2012 | ₹1,00,000 | |
4 | TARUCHAYA COLONIZERS PRIVATE LIMITED | U70109RJ2020PTC071063 | 31-12-2021 | 16-09-2020 | ₹1,00,000 | |
5 | VILASA BUILDCON LLP | AAD-6434 | 27-03-2015 | 27-03-2015 | ₹1,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00455094 | NAWAL KISHORE DANGAYACH (14) |
2 | 00461559 | PAWAN KUMAR BIYANI (6) |
3 | 01064367 | ARCHANA DANGAYACH (5) |
4 | 01328204 | TIKAM KHANDELWAL (4) |
5 | 02003176 | MAHESH DANGAYACH (5) |
6 | 02135334 | VINAY TAMBI (13) |
7 | 05290044 | NIHAL DANGAYACH (4) |
8 | 06915774 | SARIKA TAMBI (5) |
9 | 07274235 | PANKAJ GOVERDHAN KHANDELWAL (3) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.