As on : September 22,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0001120822
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | EFT CHEMICALS PRIVATE LIMITED | U24299WB2005PTC100949 | 05-01-2005 | 01-03-2005 | ₹1,00,000 | |
2 | ILPA INFRASTRUCTURE DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION | U45209WB2005GAP105475 | 02-09-2008 | 20-09-2005 | ₹0 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00084963 | AJOY KUMAR TARWAY (3) |
2 | 00099157 | SATYABRATA MUKHOPADHYAY (1) |
3 | 00561947 | ANUP KUMAR CHATTOPADHYAY (2) |
4 | 00653540 | MUKUND VASUDEO KULKARNI (9) |
5 | 00818385 | SATYABRATA MITRA (1) |
6 | 00938364 | SWAPAN KUMAR PODDER (3) |
7 | 01120822 | SANKAR DAWN (2) |
8 | 01156111 | DARSHAN SINGH SABHARWAL (4) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.