As on : September 20,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0001183055
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | RELIANCE MEDIAWORKS LIMITED | U29299MH1987PLC045446 | 14-01-2020 | 30-11-1987 | ₹11,38,07,94,155 | |
2 | SUSTAINABLE AGRO-COMMERCIAL FINANCE LIMITED | U65999MH2011PLC213640 | 09-02-2022 | 17-02-2011 | ₹1,20,00,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00007008 | SHISHIR VASANT DALAL (10) |
2 | 00053035 | ANIL BHAVARLAL JAIN (2) |
3 | 00053299 | AJIT BHAVARLAL JAIN (2) |
4 | 00181535 | ARVIND MAHADEO SONMALE (1) |
5 | 00400892 | SUSHILKUMAR AGRAWAL (7) |
6 | 01183055 | SANGEETA SHARMA (2) |
7 | 02340718 | ASHOK GUPTE KAMALAKAR (3) |
8 | 02435444 | NARENDRA DAMODAR JADHAV (6) |
9 | 06716471 | SAI UTTAM BAHIRAT PATIL (3) |
10 | 08305670 | BASANTKUMAR VIJAYSINGH VARMA (2) |
11 | 09280816 | PRABHAKAR MAHADEO BOBDE (1) |
12 | 09481171 | GOVINDAN RAMASWAMI KAUNDAR (2) |
13 | 09481171 | GOVINDAN RAMASWMI KAUNDAR (2) |
14 | 09623906 | PRABIN KUMAR JHA (1) |
15 | AALPS8130Q | PARESH NAVNITLAL SHAH (1) |
16 | AAQPB0334E | PRABHAKAR MAHADEO BOBDE (1) |
17 | AGBPV0913A | BASANTKUMAR VIJAYSINGH VARMA (1) |
18 | CCZPK1930Q | PRANALI ANIKET SULAKHE (1) |
19 | DKZPK5993N | SANTOSH KADAM (1) |
20 | FKCPS7741P | KRUTIKA MANOJ BHANUSHALI (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.