As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0001790681
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | A. A. B. DEVELOPERS LLP | AAB-7482 | 29-10-2013 | 05-09-2013 | ₹5,00,000 | |
2 | AVENUEGOLD LANDMARKS LLP | AAF-9374 | 15-03-2016 | 15-03-2016 | ₹4,00,000 | |
3 | HARMONY LANDSPACE LLP | AAK-1088 | 24-07-2017 | 24-07-2017 | ₹1,00,000 | |
4 | SAKSHI HEIGHTS PRIVATE LIMITED | U45202MH2009PTC198091 | 23-12-2009 | 23-12-2009 | ₹1,00,000 | |
5 | SANYA LIFESCIENCES PRIVATE LIMITED | U24119MH2008PTC177540 | 08-01-2008 | 01-08-2008 | ₹1,00,000 | |
6 | SHIVKASHI LANDMARKS LLP | AAX-6622 | 06-07-2021 | 06-07-2021 | ₹50,00,000 | |
7 | TRUMP LANDMARK LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNER SHIP | AAG-7205 | 20-06-2016 | 20-06-2016 | ₹80,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00311209 | RAJENDRA SINGH RAJPAL (7) |
2 | 00522615 | SACHEEN MADHUKAR MULAY (5) |
3 | 00668414 | SURESH ONKARDAS AGRAWAL (3) |
4 | 01790681 | SAMHBHAJI RAMKRISHNA ATKARE (7) |
5 | 02165034 | VINAY CHANDMAL SURANA (2) |
6 | 02411583 | PANKAJ RADHESHYAM AGRAWAL (4) |
7 | 02728273 | ARJUN RAMKRISHNA ATKARE (5) |
8 | 02969134 | NITIN VENUPRASAD BAGADIA (7) |
9 | 03083552 | VIKRAM JAWAHARLAL BOHRA (3) |
10 | 03372504 | ABHIJIT BHASKARRAO DESHMUKH (3) |
11 | 06528597 | DEEPAK JETHMAL PARMAR (1) |
12 | 06995338 | VISHAL JAWAHARLAL BOHRA (2) |
13 | 07523619 | UDAY BASHKARRAO DESHMUKH (1) |
14 | 07558025 | ANIL POPATLAL MUNOT (4) |
15 | 07828078 | UMESH POPATLAL MUNOT (1) |
16 | 09207648 | ADITYA SAMBHAJI ATKARE (2) |
17 | 10148168 | ROHAN ANIL MUNOT (3) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.