As on : September 20,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000228438
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | BIRLA POWER SOLUTIONS LIMITED | L31101MH1984PLC032773 | 14-08-2013 | 27-04-1984 | ₹2,13,51,96,905 | |
2 | BIRLA RESEARCH & LIFESCIENCES LIMITED | U24100MH2008PLC177694 | 25-05-2012 | 10-01-2008 | ₹72,71,76,900 | |
3 | BIRLA SURYA LIMITED | U74999MH2008PLC187077 | 06-08-2010 | 25-09-2008 | ₹3,35,16,15,840 | |
4 | SAHAYOG SUPER GAS PRIVATE LIMITED | U51410MH1998PTC115139 | 30-12-2006 | 28-05-1998 | ₹7,25,200 |
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Exit Date | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Served As Director For |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | BIRLA PACIFIC MEDSPA LIMITED | L85100MH2008PLC184689 | 25-05-2012 | 05-03-2015 | 15-07-2008 | ₹1,12,14,25,840 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00079576 | RAJESH VIRENDRA SHAH (1) |
2 | 00228438 | RAMPRAKASH MURLIDHAR MISHRA (5) |
3 | 00228529 | JAIPRAKASH GYAN SINGH (1) |
4 | 00232048 | VENKATARAMANA MURTHY PALAPARTHY (2) |
5 | 00857241 | TUSHAR DEY (3) |
6 | 01740853 | WILLIAM LAI LEONG CHONG (1) |
7 | 02244493 | JIGNESH BIPIN MEHTA (2) |
8 | 03584695 | ASHISH RAMESH MAHENDRAKAR (3) |
9 | 05245103 | RUBIN MALKANI TOLARAM (4) |
10 | 06936695 | DINESH SOMARI PANDIT (1) |
11 | 06936734 | CHIRANJIBI VISHNU PURI (1) |
12 | 06941520 | SATISH VASANT JADHAV (1) |
13 | 06986239 | ANIRUDHA CHANDRACANT WAGHMARE (1) |
14 | AKZPD7679R | MOHAN RAO DATARI (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.