As on : September 20,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000006135
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | CHARY LIFESCIENCES PRIVATE LIMITED | U24239TG2005PTC047011 | 29-07-2005 | 29-07-2005 | ₹1,00,000 | |
2 | GLOBARENA WEB TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED | U72200TG2000PTC034836 | 03-07-2000 | 07-03-2000 | ₹88,32,360 | |
3 | MAGENE RESEARCH FOUNDATION | U01122TG1998NPL029019 | 28-08-2006 | 03-09-1998 | ₹5,000 | |
4 | OFFICE PROPERTIES SERIES I LLP | AAM-5077 | 10-09-2018 | 27-04-2018 | ₹10,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00005042 | ANANTHA MADABHUSHINI CHARY (5) |
2 | 00005572 | SUREKHA CHARY MADABHUSHINI (2) |
3 | 00005611 | SATISH VEDALA (2) |
4 | 00006135 | RAMANJULU BHOOPATHY THUNDLAM (4) |
5 | 00157875 | RAKESH KUMAR SAH (1) |
6 | 00362555 | SOUNDARARAGHAVAN RANGACHARI (3) |
7 | 01308139 | MADHUSUDHAN LAKSHMI NARASIMHA VEDALA (3) |
8 | 01634432 | BEENA KIRTIKANT VAGADIA (1) |
9 | 02109532 | NAVEEN POTHAPU (1) |
10 | 02118573 | CHOWDARI BAPAIAH KOLLI (1) |
11 | 02822693 | ANIL POTHAPU (1) |
12 | 03198536 | ARATI ANKUR YAGNIK (3) |
13 | 05002769 | NAREN LAXMAN SHETTY (3) |
14 | 05009696 | KUNAL MOKTAN (16) |
15 | 07301820 | HASHIM QADEER KHAN (13) |
16 | 07841781 | VIJAY ANAND TANGIRALA (2) |
17 | 08338474 | SYAM SUNDER GUNDA (2) |
18 | 08430578 | ARSHEEN FARIDI (2) |
19 | 08546146 | NEEHARIKA JAKKAMPUDI (1) |
20 | 08982432 | SHALINI SINGH (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.