As on : September 20,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000046763
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | BACARDI INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED | U15549DL1996PTC083780 | 01-07-2002 | 11-12-1996 | ₹5,41,90,81,000 | |
2 | ELEVATE PROPERTIES LLP | AAE-1102 | 08-06-2015 | 08-06-2015 | ₹1,00,000 | |
3 | FISHER DYAMICS AUTOMOTIVE INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED | U34300TG2004PTC057947 | 22-06-2004 | 22-06-2004 | ₹1,00,000 | |
4 | GRAND SLAM TENNIS FOUNDATION | U74999DL2016NPL308599 | 25-11-2016 | 25-11-2016 | ₹1,00,000 | |
5 | SCORPIO CORPORATE ADVISORS LLP | AAA-1808 | 16-07-2010 | 16-07-2010 | ₹ | |
6 | SOUTHINDIA NATURAL GAS MARKETING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED | U23201TN2000PTC045852 | 25-02-2008 | 10-04-2000 | ₹1,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00046657 | KANHAIYA PRASAD (2) |
2 | 00046763 | RAMAN KUMAR SHARMA (6) |
3 | 00161587 | VIJAY KHANNA (1) |
4 | 00225817 | DEV RATTAN NAGPAUL (1) |
5 | 00228007 | JAGDISH RAO (1) |
6 | 00730415 | MICHAEL ROBERT FISHER (1) |
7 | 02813942 | RAGHU RAMA KRISHNAM RAJU KALIDINDI (1) |
8 | 06543922 | VIJAY SANKAR SUBRAMANIAM (1) |
9 | 07618941 | VIVEK SATYAJIT (1) |
10 | 08190126 | MUTHUKUMAR VEMBAN (1) |
11 | 08663507 | RADHIKA MAHESHWARI (1) |
12 | 10039869 | VINAY RAMMOHAN GOLIKERI (1) |
13 | 10188729 | OLIVER CREESE (1) |
14 | 10246580 | AMAN SHARMA (1) |
15 | ADGPN4076Q | JAYA NAGPAL PANDEY (3) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.