As on : September 22,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0006583160
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | KRV BROOMS PRIVATE LIMITED | U37100PB2022PTC055043 | 18-01-2022 | 18-01-2022 | ₹1,00,000 | |
2 | Q - ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED | U74920WB2012FTC182047 | 28-01-2015 | 23-05-2012 | ₹1,00,000 | |
3 | SRIKAYA HEALTH INSTITUTE LIMITED | U74900DL2015NPL281722 | 31-12-2015 | 18-06-2015 | ₹5,00,000 | |
4 | STANDARD CAPITAL MARKETS LIMITED | L74899DL1987PLC027057 | 18-01-2024 | 19-02-1987 | ₹4,00,01,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00287019 | GHANSHYAM PRASAD GUPTA (1) |
2 | 06583133 | GAURAV JINDAL (5) |
3 | 06583160 | RAM GOPAL JINDAL (4) |
4 | 06583160 | RAM JINDAL (4) |
5 | 06717525 | ASHOK BHALOTIA (1) |
6 | 07581193 | MADHU (3) |
7 | 08084104 | DIVYA KWATRA (1) |
8 | 09472346 | VISHAL SHARMA (3) |
9 | 09706011 | ANSHITA SHARMA (1) |
10 | 09707228 | AYUSHI SIKKA (1) |
11 | 10465851 | CHHAVI DIXIT (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.