As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000329884
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | A P M DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED | U70109WB1998PTC086581 | 24-05-2003 | 18-02-1998 | ₹4,54,000 | |
2 | ABSOLUTE REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED | U70109WB2011PTC159314 | 25-12-2020 | 17-02-2011 | ₹1,00,000 | |
3 | ADARSH REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED | U70101WB2006PTC111972 | 31-12-2020 | 30-11-2006 | ₹3,00,000 | |
4 | ARADHYA FOODS PRIVATE LIMITED | U15135WB2008PTC121522 | 31-12-2020 | 01-08-2008 | ₹2,45,000 | |
5 | BRAHMA COMMOTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED | U51909WB2011PTC162291 | 17-03-2015 | 05-04-2011 | ₹1,00,000 | |
6 | KANNAN VILLA LLP | ABB-2982 | 06-06-2022 | 06-06-2022 | ₹1,00,000 | |
7 | KAVEESHA HIRISE PRIVATE LIMITED | U70102WB2013PTC196554 | 25-12-2020 | 16-08-2013 | ₹1,00,000 | |
8 | RKK FOODS LLP | AAW-4347 | 22-03-2021 | 22-03-2021 | ₹4,00,000 | |
9 | SHIVIKA PROMOTERS LLP | AAM-6454 | 01-04-2020 | 17-05-2018 | ₹75,981 | |
10 | V NATH & CO (CONSTRUCTION) PVT LTD | U45201WB1981PTC033865 | 11-03-2015 | 07-08-1981 | ₹3,50,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00145697 | RAJESH KUMAR KEDIA (10) |
2 | 00329884 | RAKESH KUMAR KEDIA (10) |
3 | 00329923 | ARUN KUMAR KEDIA (16) |
4 | 00799167 | SHIV KUMAR JAIN (1) |
5 | 00799217 | PRAMILA KEDIA (12) |
6 | 00824491 | SUBHASH KUMAR KEDIA (3) |
7 | 00918232 | SANGEETA DEVI KEDIA (9) |
8 | 00918281 | ASHOK KUMAR KEDIA (11) |
9 | 03087547 | SHANTI DEVI BANKA (8) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.