As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0002211223
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | ENDURA PROJECTS AND INFRASTRUCTURE PVT LTD | U45201TG2006PTC050789 | 10-09-2009 | 08-02-2006 | ₹0 | |
2 | FIRST ACADEMY OF BLOCKCHAIN COUNCIL | U80900TG2022NPL158589 | 01-03-2022 | 06-01-2022 | ₹2,000 | |
3 | OCTAGON MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED | U74140TG2009PTC064163 | 26-06-2009 | 26-06-2009 | ₹1,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 01049976 | MANISH SHARMA (2) |
2 | 01075185 | BALARAM BHATI (2) |
3 | 01203352 | RITIKA SRIVASTAVA (1) |
4 | 01204596 | GANTA SRINIVAS REDDY (1) |
5 | 01588767 | KESHAVAPATNAM BHANU SREE (3) |
6 | 02172669 | KESHAVAPATNAM PHANENDRA KUMAR (3) |
7 | 02211223 | RAHUL SRIVASTAVA (3) |
8 | 02734571 | VENU GOPAL KESHAVAPATNAM (1) |
9 | 02735958 | VISHAL SRIVASTAV (3) |
10 | 02750160 | NEHA SRIVASTAVA (2) |
11 | 06691299 | NISHANT MISHRA (2) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.