As on : September 23,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000116550
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | ANKESH GROUP HOUSING PRIVATE LIMITED | U70101RJ1993PTC007610 | 21-01-2020 | 08-12-1993 | ₹50,00,000 | |
2 | DIGGI KALYAN TEX PRIVATE LIMITED | U17124RJ1997PTC014474 | 02-12-1997 | 12-02-1997 | ₹15,00,000 | |
3 | GAJANAN ENCLAVE PRIVATE LIMITED | U45201RJ2002PTC017903 | 16-12-2002 | 11-01-2002 | ₹26,00,000 | |
4 | NAV BHARAT FINWORTH PRIVATE LIMITED | U67120RJ1993PTC007228 | 17-02-1993 | 17-02-1993 | ₹10,50,010 | |
5 | ROOP BEAUTY CARE PRIVATE LIMITED | U93090RJ2001PTC016846 | 30-09-2003 | 23-01-2001 | ₹1,02,00,000 | |
6 | SHIVNANDAN REALESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED | U45201RJ2007PTC024127 | 02-04-2007 | 04-02-2007 | ₹1,00,000 | |
7 | SURYODAYA MARBLES PRIVATE LIMITED | U14101RJ1998PTC014973 | 30-09-1999 | 20-07-1998 | ₹49,76,500 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00116408 | SHYAM BIHARI AGARWAL (5) |
2 | 00116477 | SOMIT AGARWAL (8) |
3 | 00116550 | RADHEY SHYAM AGARWAL (7) |
4 | 00117053 | SANTOSH KUMAR AGARWAL (2) |
5 | 00175898 | MAHESH KUMAR GUPTA (10) |
6 | 00175945 | HEERU GUPTA (7) |
7 | 00410806 | SURENDRA KUMAR BHANDARI (7) |
8 | 01411875 | AJAY KUMAR ANCHALIA (4) |
9 | 02210691 | GOVIND SINGH (6) |
10 | 03607290 | ANKESH AGARWAL (15) |
11 | 08763526 | PRIYANKA AGARWAL (2) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.