As on : September 22,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000576207
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | ANAMIKA CAPITAL FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED | U74899WB1995PTC132699 | 24-05-2010 | 20-01-1995 | ₹1,74,15,000 | |
2 | MEGHALAYA ALLOYS PRIVATE LIMITED | U27101ML2002PTC006866 | 22-03-2010 | 28-06-2002 | ₹1,00,20,000 | |
3 | SATYA MEGHA ISPAT PRIVATE LIMITED | U27106ML2001PTC006631 | 01-10-2002 | 21-09-2001 | ₹3,92,00,000 | |
4 | SATYAM STEELS AND ALLOYS PVT LTD | U27109ML1996PTC004815 | 15-07-2002 | 22-07-1996 | ₹82,49,700 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00512188 | SANDEEP KUMAR BHAGAT (6) |
2 | 00538325 | SURESH SHARMA (3) |
3 | 00576207 | PURUSHOTAM MURARKA (4) |
4 | 02174473 | SEEMA MURARKA (1) |
5 | 02530019 | SYNLAR SINGH HYNNIEWTA (2) |
6 | 02909846 | HARSH SHARMA (5) |
7 | 06568055 | PALLAVI DEVI (2) |
8 | 07659730 | RADHIKA DEVI (1) |
9 | 08698269 | RAJ KUMAR SHARMA (6) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.