As on : September 23,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0002962151
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | AD CONSULTANTS PVT.LTD. | U74140WB1989PTC046721 | 15-03-2013 | 17-04-1989 | ₹8,24,500 | |
2 | ARJUNA PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED | U45309WB2017PTC219032 | 27-04-2019 | 20-01-2017 | ₹3,00,000 | |
3 | FINOPTICS COMMERCIAL LLP | AAQ-6764 | 26-09-2019 | 26-09-2019 | ₹50,000 | |
4 | INOX SUPPLY PRIVATE LIMITED | U51101WB2010PTC146060 | 01-04-2021 | 26-04-2010 | ₹1,00,000 | |
5 | INSENT DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED | U51101WB2010PTC146061 | 01-04-2021 | 26-04-2010 | ₹1,00,000 | |
6 | INTERCITY INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED | U45400WB2009PTC136579 | 01-04-2021 | 07-07-2009 | ₹16,30,000 | |
7 | OMSAI BUSINESS LLP | AAS-6284 | 15-06-2020 | 15-06-2020 | ₹1,00,000 | |
8 | OTAN DAS & CO (MINING) PRIVATE LIMITED | U14200WB2009PTC134887 | 12-06-2019 | 05-02-2009 | ₹11,56,94,300 | |
9 | SILVERTREE INFRA LLP | AAE-8108 | 22-07-2022 | 24-09-2015 | ₹1,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00626122 | AJAY RAMPURIA (3) |
2 | 01416919 | KRISHNA KUMAR DOKANIA (3) |
3 | 02664850 | JAYESH MAITRA MAJUMDER (9) |
4 | 02819353 | POONAM AGARWALA (2) |
5 | 02962151 | PRATIK AGARWALA (9) |
6 | 03064550 | SAJAL GHOSH (3) |
7 | 05240042 | VIDUSHI MANDHYAN AGARWALA (1) |
8 | 05240080 | ARTI MANDHYAN (4) |
9 | 06829765 | AYUSH AGARWALA (6) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.