As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0003311923
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | SAMRUDDHA FOODS CORPORATION INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED | U15400PN2014PTC150365 | 30-04-2014 | 28-01-2014 | ₹1,00,000 | |
2 | SAMRUDDHA JEEVAN CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED | U45200PN2011PTC140736 | 28-09-2012 | 09-12-2011 | ₹1,00,000 | |
3 | SAMRUDDHA JEEVAN FINVEST LIMITED | U65910PN2011PLC139882 | 16-06-2011 | 16-06-2011 | ₹25,60,000 | |
4 | SAMRUDDHA JEEVAN INFOTECH INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED | U72200PN2011PTC140658 | 29-09-2012 | 09-06-2011 | ₹1,00,000 | |
5 | STANCE HOTELS AND HOSPITALITY PRIVATE LIMITED | U55101PN2009PTC134851 | 27-09-2012 | 16-10-2009 | ₹1,00,000 | |
6 | SUVARNAMUDRA HOTELS AND RESORTS (PUNE) LIMITED | U55101PN2007PLC131084 | 02-03-2015 | 12-10-2007 | ₹5,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00054860 | MAHESH KISAN MOTEWAR (9) |
2 | 01632576 | RAGHAVENDRA SANJEEVA SHETTY (8) |
3 | 01641001 | SHRIDHAR NARASAIAH DULORI (10) |
4 | 01641056 | MAHESH ACHANNA SHETTY (2) |
5 | 02750035 | VAISHALI MAHESH MOTEWAR (11) |
6 | 03134021 | SONALI BOTKULVAR (3) |
7 | 03311923 | PRASAD KISHOR PARASWAR (6) |
8 | 07412119 | PRIYANKA DEVIDAS SONAWANE (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.