As on : September 22,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0002250891
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | AVAN LOGISTICS TECHNOLOGY LAB PRIVATELIMITED | U60232MH2016PTC285323 | 31-12-2020 | 30-08-2016 | ₹1,00,000 | |
2 | CREDENCE LOGISTICS LIMITED | U63090WB1991PLC052729 | 30-06-2022 | 16-08-1991 | ₹7,37,13,300 | |
3 | NAVDHANYA BIOTECH PRIVATE LIMITED | U32109WB1998PTC087559 | 10-02-2014 | 21-07-1998 | ₹3,12,000 | |
4 | PLUTUS LOTTERIES PRIVATE LIMITED | U52591MH2001PTC132918 | 10-04-2017 | 31-07-2001 | ₹27,00,000 | |
5 | RAJHANS MERCANDISE PRIVATE LIMITED | U51900MH1996PTC103628 | 29-11-2021 | 29-10-1996 | ₹1,14,88,000 | |
6 | SRI MAHALAXMI SOLAR ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED | U40300MH2010PTC206913 | 30-09-2023 | 24-08-2010 | ₹1,00,000 | |
7 | TELESTEELS INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED | U51900MH1998PTC113995 | 29-11-2021 | 16-03-1998 | ₹74,00,000 | |
8 | TURNKEY STEELS INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED | U51900MH1998PTC113996 | 29-11-2021 | 16-03-1998 | ₹30,48,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00008518 | RAMJI LAL VIJAY (3) |
2 | 00011137 | ANIRUDH MISHRA (5) |
3 | 00610474 | SHWETA UMESH ROGE (8) |
4 | 02034951 | SANTOSH MAJUMDAR (1) |
5 | 02250891 | NAMDEO SHANKAR ZAGADE (8) |
6 | 05233428 | SURENDRA GARG (4) |
7 | 06776041 | PANKAJ BHUSAN BANERJEE (1) |
8 | 07995394 | SURESH KUMAR MOHANLAL YADAV (2) |
9 | 07995405 | MANOJ KUMAR (7) |
10 | 08425442 | MILIND NILKANTH MANDE (6) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.