As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0003575675
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | AKHYAR ESTATE HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED | U74900TN2016PTC104625 | 30-09-2019 | 10-03-2016 | ₹1,00,000 | |
2 | ANKITA PRATISTHAN LIMITED | U65993TN1983PLC113645 | 10-08-2023 | 31-01-1983 | ₹96,28,000 | |
3 | DALMIA REFRACTORIES LIMITED | L24297TN1973PLC006372 | 06-08-2015 | 21-06-1973 | ₹3,15,20,840 | |
4 | FINEHOME TECHNOLOGIES LLP | AAY-6204 | 16-09-2021 | ₹1,00,000 | ||
5 | FINEHOME TECHNOLOGIES LLP | AAY-6204 | 16-09-2021 | 16-09-2021 | ₹1,00,000 | |
6 | MAYUKA INVESTMENT LIMITED | U65993TN1982PLC113721 | 21-08-2023 | 24-07-1982 | ₹29,85,38,120 | |
7 | MAYUKA INVESTMENT LIMITED | U65993TN1982PLC113721 | 30-09-2023 | 24-07-1982 | ₹29,85,38,120 | |
8 | TIJORI CAPITAL PRIVATE LIMITED | U65923DL2015PTC283397 | 26-09-2016 | 30-07-2015 | ₹2,00,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00012972 | ASHWANI KUMAR BHATIA (7) |
2 | 00125680 | CHANDRA NARAIN MAHESHWARI (4) |
3 | 00266838 | CHANDRASEKARAN NAGARATNAM (1) |
4 | 01573314 | MUDIT PARASHAR (1) |
5 | 02421599 | DEEPAK THOMBRE (3) |
6 | 03575675 | LEENA RAWAL (6) |
7 | 05200610 | HEMANT KUMAR (4) |
8 | 06599230 | SAMEER NAGPAL (3) |
9 | 06612329 | KUNAL MEHTA (11) |
10 | 08304397 | SHWETA CHADHA (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.