As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000143650
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | A G R CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED | U45200TG1997PTC028180 | 30-06-2015 | 15-10-1997 | ₹15,00,000 | |
2 | ABCK VENTURES LLP | AAQ-9532 | 04-11-2019 | 04-11-2019 | ₹1,00,000 | |
3 | APURUPA DT INFRA LLP | AAB-7389 | 02-09-2013 | 02-09-2013 | ₹4,50,00,000 | |
4 | LA BELLEZZA LIVING LLP | AAU-6857 | 12-11-2020 | 12-11-2020 | ₹1,00,000 | |
5 | MEGASREE ORGANICS LLP | AAU-6235 | 09-11-2020 | 09-11-2020 | ₹1,00,000 | |
6 | MEGASRI CONSTRUCTIONS LIMITED | U45200TG1996PLC023655 | 06-05-1996 | 29-03-1996 | ₹81,40,000 | |
7 | MEGASRI DUKES CONSTRUCTIONS LLP | AAB-4896 | 26-04-2013 | 26-04-2013 | ₹10,00,000 | |
8 | MEGASRI V ARTS LLP | AAX-4074 | 15-06-2021 | 15-06-2021 | ₹1,00,000 | |
9 | Messor Infra LLP | ACB-4465 | 31-05-2023 | 31-05-2023 | ₹6,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00065641 | ANIL REDDY KUTUR (3) |
2 | 00065897 | VEDRE AJAY KUMAR REDDY (5) |
3 | 00083388 | MADDI NARSAIAH (19) |
4 | 00095325 | ASHISH AGARWAL (5) |
5 | 00143573 | MURALIDHAR REDDY KOPPULA (3) |
6 | 00143650 | KOPPULA REDDY SREEDHAR (9) |
7 | 00413281 | KOPPULA GIRIDHAR REDDY (1) |
8 | 01494295 | RAMA KOTESWAR RAO YALAMANCHALI (1) |
9 | 03188469 | BALASUBRAMANIAM SIVAKUMAR (2) |
10 | 03204006 | SAMARTH AGARWAL (4) |
11 | 03435400 | CHAKRADHAR MALAKAPALLI (3) |
12 | 05295653 | VIJITHA REDDY KOPPULA (2) |
13 | 06510355 | RAJNISH AGARWAL (4) |
14 | 06647801 | THATI ANUP KUMAR (1) |
15 | 08578798 | BALKRISHNA AGARWAL (2) |
16 | 08960023 | DEEPAKKUMAR (1) |
17 | 09162878 | SANJAY REDDY KOPPULA (2) |
18 | 09162919 | AJAY REDDY KOPPULA (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.