As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000798996
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | BLR RESTAURANTS PRIVATE LIMITED | U55200KA2022PTC168795 | 01-02-2023 | 09-12-2022 | ₹1,00,000 | |
2 | SRI DURGAMBA INFRASTRUCTURE LLP | AAC-2329 | 11-08-2014 | 02-04-2014 | ₹3,05,32,500 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00747081 | SATHYANARAYANA BALASHANMUGAM (2) |
2 | 00798996 | KOMARLA AKHILESH BABU SUJITCHANDAN (2) |
3 | 00993443 | MUNUGUR NARASIMHAN VENKATESH (3) |
4 | 01644277 | AKKISETTY RATHNAM PRASAD (2) |
5 | 01854601 | SUNKU ASWATHANARANAIAHSETTY SRINIVAS (1) |
6 | 02029367 | MAKAM JAYAPRAKASH KRISHNAMURTHY (1) |
7 | 02150025 | ASHWIN DIGAMBAR RAIKAR (3) |
8 | 02614847 | MEENAKSHI RAMASWAMY (1) |
9 | 03023142 | MINOO PAL SINGH (1) |
10 | 06829377 | VACHAN JAGADEESH SUNKU (2) |
11 | 06856613 | RAMANJANEYULU THAYI (1) |
12 | 06929495 | PRASANNA KUMAR SIVANANDAN (7) |
13 | 07512838 | THANGALA VENU GOPAL (7) |
14 | 07542304 | PRADEEP DINAKAR BIJUR (1) |
15 | 07563832 | RAJARAM GUPTA (3) |
16 | 07605691 | SHU SANG CHUNG (1) |
17 | 07644044 | UMANG VINOD NAIR (1) |
18 | 09366258 | SADASHIVA RAJU AMIN (1) |
19 | 09404101 | KOMARLA VENKATESH VISHNU (2) |
20 | 10092053 | SREEDHAR VENKATRAMAN (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.