As on : September 23,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0001123127
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | CITY WONDER COLONIZERS PRIVATE LIMITED | U45201RJ1999PTC015482 | 31-03-2014 | 23-03-1999 | ₹1,33,330 | |
2 | PINKCITY SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED | U72900RJ2015PTC047398 | 20-04-2015 | 20-04-2015 | ₹1,00,000 | |
3 | SARV SIDDHI ENCLAVE LLP | AAD-6470 | 27-03-2015 | 27-03-2015 | ₹2,05,000 | |
4 | SARV SIDDHI ENCLAVE PRIVATE LIMITED | U70101RJ2011PTC037269 | 08-12-2011 | 12-08-2011 | ₹2,05,000 | |
5 | SHREE INFRALINE PRIVATE LIMITED | U45201RJ2010PTC032404 | 09-10-2013 | 19-07-2010 | ₹2,28,000 | |
6 | WISDOM INFRAHEIGHTS PRIVATE LIMITED | U45201RJ2013PTC042385 | 03-05-2013 | 05-03-2013 | ₹1,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00120065 | RAJESH KUMAR GUPTA (13) |
2 | 00172144 | JUGAL KISHORE GARG (22) |
3 | 00542463 | RITESH AGARWAL (20) |
4 | 01058295 | SHRI CHAND SIGAR (4) |
5 | 01123127 | KAUSHAL KISHORE (6) |
6 | 03467967 | HEMANT KUMAR GARG (3) |
7 | 03467971 | PAWAN KUMAR GUPTA (2) |
8 | 05206157 | VINOD KUMAR AGRAWAL (3) |
9 | 06942470 | GOVERDHAN AGARWAL (7) |
10 | 07074539 | LAL CHAND KATARIYA (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.