As on : September 24,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0008041880
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | BHAGWATKRIPA COMMERCIALS PRIVATE LIMITED | U52190RJ2005PTC020148 | 30-12-2023 | 19-01-2005 | ₹2,38,000 | |
2 | HALLEYS DREAMWORKS PRIVATE LIMITED | U45100MH2011PTC211810 | 22-02-2023 | 01-04-2011 | ₹1,00,000 | |
3 | KEEMAYA REALCON PRIVATE LIMITED | U45100MH2010PTC202990 | 25-09-2021 | 11-05-2010 | ₹1,00,000 | |
4 | KEEMAYA VENTURES LIMITED LIABILITY PARTN ERSHIP | AAE-7180 | 20-02-2023 | 08-09-2015 | ₹1,00,000 | |
5 | SAVERA AGROTECH PRIVATE LIMITED | U01100RJ2005PTC021385 | 04-08-2023 | 03-10-2005 | ₹1,00,000 | |
6 | YASH VENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED | U65999MH2008PTC179483 | 31-12-2020 | 27-02-2008 | ₹1,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00242049 | DINESHKUMAR DWARKAPRASAD BANSAL (4) |
2 | 00294732 | LAL CHAND MEENA (1) |
3 | 00401872 | KAVITA DINESHKUMAR BANSAL (5) |
4 | 01226212 | JAGDISH PODDAR (2) |
5 | 02021002 | RAJENDRA SINGH (1) |
6 | 02167540 | MEGHA SANJAY BANSAL (1) |
7 | 03387069 | DEVANSHU DINESHKUMAR BANSAL (13) |
8 | 03506671 | DIPESH BRIJKISHOR NIRUPAM (4) |
9 | 07969610 | SHAILESH BANSAL (4) |
10 | 08041880 | JITENDRA RAI (6) |
11 | 08183047 | ANJU GUPTA (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.