As on : September 20,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0009055150
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | AASHAY FINANCE AND INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED | U65929MH2020PTC336729 | 23-09-2022 | 28-01-2020 | ₹1,00,000 | |
2 | AQUINOX BUSINESS SERVICES LLP | AAY-8548 | 30-06-2022 | 01-10-2021 | ₹10,00,000 | |
3 | SEJAL GLASS LIMITED | L26100MH1998PLC117437 | 30-09-2021 | 12-11-1998 | ₹33,55,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 01493607 | VIJAY VASANJI MAMANIA (1) |
2 | 01642373 | NEHA RAJEN GADA (7) |
3 | 02456666 | SURJI CHHEDA DAMJI (3) |
4 | 07968526 | PARIN MUKESH GOGRI (3) |
5 | 08532321 | CHIRAG HIMATLAL DOSHI (3) |
6 | 09055150 | JIGGAR LAKSHMICHAND SAVLA (3) |
7 | 09343582 | KALPANA MUKESH GOGRI (2) |
8 | 09451669 | MANILAL DAMU NERKAR (1) |
9 | 09556394 | AMRUTA SHRIPAD PATANKAR (1) |
10 | 09607503 | PURNIMA PARESH SATRA (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.